MD SB447 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law requiring a therapeutically certified optometrist to refer a certain patient to an ophthalmologist under certain circumstances; altering the types of therapeutic pharmaceutical agents a therapeutically certified optometrist is authorized to administer or prescribe; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {566780/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {824130/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Curriculum
Data
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Examinations
Health and Higher Educational Facilities Authority
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Ophthalmologists
Optometrists
Patients
Photography
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Time
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Curriculum
Data
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Examinations
Health and Higher Educational Facilities Authority
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Licenses
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Ophthalmologists
Optometrists
Patients
Photography
Physicians
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Time