MD SB447 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale any juvenile product, mattress, upholstered furniture, or reupholstered furniture that contains more than 0.1% of flame-retardant chemicals by mass; repealing certain provisions of law regarding the importing, sale, or offering for sale of any child care product containing certain chemicals; establishing certain civil penalties; requiring the Secretary of Health to consider certain factors in determining the amount of a certain penalty; etc.
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-34) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {187078/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB424 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Age
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Courts
Equipment
Fines
Fire Protection
Foreign Trade
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Courts
Equipment
Fines
Fire Protection
Foreign Trade
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 24 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 306.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |