MD SB449 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to appear at a precinct polling place in the individual's county of residence and apply to register to vote; requiring an applicant for a voter registration on election day to provide proof of residency; specifying the acceptable forms of proof of residency; requiring an election judge to determine whether an applicant for voter registration resides in the precinct and is qualified to become a registered voter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {363923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-96) (Y: 40 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-41) (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
2019-04-02SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2019-04-02SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (95-41)
2019-03-29HouseFloor Amendment {363923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-96)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {625360/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-14HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2019-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {984134/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-08SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {984134/1
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0449&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0449f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0449t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0449e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_755_sb0449e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0449_98413401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0449_62536001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0449_36392301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0449.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0449_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0498.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0449_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0935.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback