MD SB457 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a local government to create a Resilience Authority by local law; specifying certain requirements for the adoption of a local law establishing an Authority; specifying the powers that a local government may grant an Authority; authorizing an Authority to issue certain bonds for certain purposes; authorizing the local governing body to dedicate certain revenues of the local government to the repayment of bonds and to support operations or resilience infrastructure projects of an Authority; etc.
Title
Local Governments - Resilience Authorities - Authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 236 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-20) |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {940312/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {654136/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB539 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 235
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Bonds
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Flood Control
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Real Property
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Bonds
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Flood Control
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Real Property
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 22 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 22 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |