MD SB459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before September 30, 2020, the Office of the Attorney General to post on its website an advisory protocol and voluntary training webinar for health care providers regarding how to respond to compulsory process requests for medical records; requiring and authorizing the Office to consult certain entities in developing the advisory protocol and voluntary training webinar; requiring the Office to track the traffic on its website beginning on September 30, 2020, to the extent practicable; etc.
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {457178/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Dentists
Disclosure
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Job Training
Notices
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Social Workers
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Attorney General
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Dentists
Disclosure
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Job Training
Notices
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Social Workers
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology