MD SB461 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $38,250,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Carroll County, including water and sewer projects, to finance loans for fire or emergency-related equipment, buildings, and other facilities of volunteer fire departments in the County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB645 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Bridges and Tunnels
Carroll County
Community Colleges
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Easements
Equipment
Farmland
Fire Protection
Forests and Parks
Health Care Facilities
Highways
Interest
Libraries
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Property Tax
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works
Refuse Disposal
Sewage
Social Services
Water
Carroll County
Community Colleges
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Easements
Equipment
Farmland
Fire Protection
Forests and Parks
Health Care Facilities
Highways
Interest
Libraries
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Property Tax
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works
Refuse Disposal
Sewage
Social Services
Water