MD SB464 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the June 30, 2019, termination date for a provision of law that increased from $250 to $500 the civil penalty for a violation recorded by a school bus monitoring camera for failure to stop for a school vehicle operating alternately flashing red lights.
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty - Sunset Repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |