MD SB465 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each nonpublic school in the State to hold fire drills in accordance with the State Fire Prevention Code, keep records of the fire drills, and send copies of the records to the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonpublic Schools - Fire Drill Requirements - State Fire Prevention Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {633123/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (35-101) (Y: 35 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-29) (Y: 107 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430
2019-03-28SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (107-29)
2019-03-27HouseFloor Amendment {633123/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (35-101)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback