MD SB465 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending and altering through fiscal year 2026 the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an amount that when combined with the amount estimated to be distributed to the E-Nnovation Initiative Fund under certain provisions of law equals at least $8,500,000; altering certain requirements for certain individuals in certain positions funded by certain endowment proceeds; altering the distribution of certain revenue; providing certain contingencies; etc.
Title
Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {525968/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {219838/1 Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB135 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Bingo
Budgets
Electronic Commerce
Gaming
Governor
Gratuities
Higher Education
Nonprofit Organizations
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Bingo
Budgets
Electronic Commerce
Gaming
Governor
Gratuities
Higher Education
Nonprofit Organizations
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 6 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 614 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |