MD SB466 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a limitation on the authority of certain municipalities to impose a hotel rental tax on hotels with 10 or fewer sleeping rooms.
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-26) (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-26) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |