MD SB470 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a homeowner's insurance claim under certain circumstances; prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a private passenger motor vehicle insurance claim under certain circumstances; and authorizing certain insurers to consider certain claim information when rating certain insurance policies under certain circumstances.
Title
Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-32) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {647376/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB431 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Claims
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Real Property
Records
Claims
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Real Property
Records