MD SB472 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the month of August as Caribbean Heritage Month in recognition of the contributions that Caribbean Americans have made to the State; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Caribbean Heritage Month in Maryland properly with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions – Commemorative Months – Caribbean Heritage Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {444234/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback