MD SB477 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the application of a provision of law that prohibits mobile seafood vendors from operating on a State highway right-of-way without a State lease to include mobile produce vendors; authorizing the State to require a mobile seafood or produce vendor to submit an application and pay a specified fee; prohibiting the State from entering into a lease with a mobile produce vendor unless the applicable county licenses mobile produce vendors; prohibiting a mobile produce vendor lessee from operating at specified locations; etc.
Title
State Highways - Mobile Produce Vendors - Required State Lease
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Rona Kramer [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (114-25) | |
2010-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Churches
Citations
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Food
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Shopping Centers
Transient Merchants
Citations
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Food
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Shopping Centers
Transient Merchants