MD SB477 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, for specified purposes relating to domestic violence, the definition of "person eligible for relief" to include an individual who has had a sexual relationship with the respondent within 1 year before filing the petition; establishing a specified exception to a provision that authorizes the court to include in a final protective order a requirement that specified individuals participate in specified counseling or a domestic violence program.
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {162616/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {458170/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |