MD SB477 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from a specified reemployment earnings limitation specified retirees whose average final compensation was less than $25,000 and who are reemployed while receiving an ordinary disability retirement allowance from the State Retirement and Pension System.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Ordinary Disability Retirees - Earnings Limitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {279532/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Disabilities
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment