MD SB477 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian to deny inspection of a distribution list and a request to be added to a distribution list that identifies a physical address, an e-mail address, or a telephone number of an individual that is used by a governmental entity or an elected official for the sole purpose of periodically sending news about certain activities or sending informational notices or emergency alerts; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-5) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Identification
Inspections
Notices
Postal Service
Privacy
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telephones
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Identification
Inspections
Notices
Postal Service
Privacy
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telephones