MD SB481 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy to report by December 1, 2021 and each December 1 thereafter, to the Governor, the House Judiciary Committee, and the Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee, certain information for the preceding calendar year for cases involving a crime of violence; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, in consultation with the Commission, to analyze the use of American Bar Association pleas in calendar year 2019 and submit a certain report; etc.
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Annual Report – Crimes of Violence
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {268671/1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {268671/1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {268671/1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB780 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Public Safety
Reports
Violence
Vulnerable Adults
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Public Safety
Reports
Violence
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 209.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |