MD SB486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement Agency to adjust a certain reduction of a retiree's accidental or special disability retirement benefit to reflect any offset awarded to the retiree's employer by the Workers' Compensation Commission.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Workers' Compensation Offset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Workers' Compensation
Disabilities
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Workers' Compensation