MD SB487 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System to receive credit for certain military service even if the member receives military service credit in another retirement system.
Title
Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 3:30 p.m. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1027 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Pensions and Retirement
Time
Veterans
Work, Labor and Employment
Correctional Officers
Law Enforcement
Retirement
State Pensions and Retirement
Time
Veterans
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 38 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0487?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0487f.pdf |