MD SB488 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB370
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax to $20,000 for certain military retirement income for individuals who are at least 55 years old; increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax to $10,000 for certain retirement income attributable to an individual's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services worker if the individual is at least 55 years old; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609933/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB488 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Subjects
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |