MD SB490 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from using a scanning device to scan or swipe an individual's identification card or a driver's license to obtain personal information; prohibiting a person from retaining, selling, or transferring any information collected from scanning or swiping an individual's identification card or driver's license; providing that nothing in the Act prohibits a law enforcement officer from using a scanning device to record, retain, or transmit information if acting within the scope of the officer's official duties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-21HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {783228/2 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2019-03-13SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2019-03-13SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {657075/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback