MD SB493 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the required minimum appropriation for the Small Business Development Center Network Fund from $950,000 to $1,150,000 for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2021.
Title
Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {224861/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {719636/1 Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB492 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.