MD SB494 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prince George's County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup to report certain findings and recommendations and to provide a status report on the implementation of certain recommendations to certain entities on or before December 31, 2019, and December 31, 2020; and extending the termination date for the Workgroup to June 30, 2021.
Title
Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup - Reporting and Sunset Extension PG 510-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education - Local Bills
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Construction
Education - Local Bills
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset