MD SB495 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person, subject to certain limitations, to directly or indirectly advertise for or solicit business in the State for a diagnostic laboratory test or procedure ordered by a physician and performed by a medical laboratory that is certified under 42 U.S.C. ยง 263a; requiring a certain person to disclose that the test or procedure may or may not be covered by health insurance; authorizing the Secretary of Health to take legal action to restrict the marketing of the test or procedure under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Laboratories - Laboratory Tests and Procedures - Advertising

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {626087/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-29HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {287677/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0495&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0495f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0495t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0495e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_413_sb0495e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0495_28767701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0495_62608701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0495.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0495_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0811.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0495_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1507.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1344.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback