MD SB496 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that "creditable service" does not include unused sick leave with regard to determining eligibility to participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program (DROP) by members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; and clarifying that "creditable service" does not include unused sick leave with regard to determining the length of time members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may participate the DROP.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-05 | Hearing 2/18 at 8:00 a.m. | |
2010-02-05 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-04 | Hearing 2/18 at 8:30 a.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |