MD SB496 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a law enforcement agency to make a specified request to a State's Attorney to have a specified unexecuted warrant, summons, or other criminal process invalidated and destroyed under specified circumstances; authorizing the State's Attorney to petition a specified administrative judge for the invalidation and destruction of a specified unexecuted warrant, summons, or other criminal process; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (101-26) | |
2012-04-03 | Conference Committee Report 203620/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-31 | Delegates Vallario, Carter, and Smigiel | |
2012-03-31 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-31 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (121-15) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 472016/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-04-02 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Conference Committee Report 203620/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senators Gladden, Ramirez, and Shank | |
2012-03-29 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) 883828/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 298776/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 298776/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Arrests
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Judges
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Search and Seizure
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Judges
Law Enforcement
Petitions
Search and Seizure
State's Attorneys
Summonses