MD SB496 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance program to provide a specified reimbursement for services delivered by telemedicine under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations for a specified purpose; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {156484/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {627774/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology