MD SB496 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission adopt regulations to allow a video lottery operation licensee to reduce proceeds from video lottery terminals and table games if a video lottery operation licensee returns to successful players more than the amount of money bet through video lottery terminals or table games on a specified day; and requiring the regulations to provide for the length of time that any reduction may be carried forward.
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-18) (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-26) (Y: 114 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {833323/1 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected (22-109) (Y: 22 N: 109 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-26) (Y: 114 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {833323/1 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected (22-109) (Y: 22 N: 109 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-18) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Recede |
2017-04-08 | House | Motion Recede (Delegate Turner) Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (114-26) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Floor Amendment {843123/1 (Delegate Gutierrez) Rejected |
2017-03-31 | House | Floor Amendment {833323/1 (Delegate Barkley) Rejected (22-109) |
2017-03-30 | House | Special Order until 03/31 (Delegate Barkley) Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {555969/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred Budget and Taxation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations
Time
Video
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations
Time
Video