MD SB496 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to use graywater for certain residential purposes, including household gardening, composting, lawn watering, landscape irrigation, and toilet and urinal flushing under certain circumstances and in accordance with certain requirements; defining the term "graywater" to mean used, untreated water generated by the use of and collected from a shower, bathtub, or lavatory sink; and requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Environment – Graywater – Residential Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {820817/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {534837/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Housing
Insects
Pest Control
Plumbing
Rules and Regulations
Toilets
Water
Weights and Measures
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Housing
Insects
Pest Control
Plumbing
Rules and Regulations
Toilets
Water
Weights and Measures