MD SB496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a holder of a license with an on-sale privilege in Harford County to keep certain records at the location designated in the license or another location in the county; requiring a certain license holder, on 5 days' notice, to make certain records available for inspection by the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County or a designee of the Board; requiring the Board to impose a certain fine under certain circumstances; and authorizing the Board to suspend a certain license under certain circumstances.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sale License Record Keeping and Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 392 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB963 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 391
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Disclosure
Examinations
Fines
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Disclosure
Examinations
Fines
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |