MD SB499 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the composition of the Baltimore Police Department to consist of not less than 20% civilian employees beginning on January 1, 2022; and requiring the Department to report by January 1, 2022, and every 6 months thereafter, on the number of police officers and civilian employees employed by the Department to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and the Baltimore City Delegation to the General Assembly.
Title
Baltimore City – Baltimore Police Department – Percentage of Civilian Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {172113/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |