MD SB5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a custodian of records to grant inspection of part of a 9-1-1 communications record under certain circumstances after providing certain notice and considering certain information; requiring a custodian to grant or deny a certain application within a certain period of time; authorizing a custodian to redact certain information if a failure to do so would result in a constructive denial of the entire public record; requiring a custodian to allow inspection by the person in interest; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Committee Amendment Adopted (31-16) (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Committee Amendment Adopted (31-16) (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted (31-16) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424533/1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424533/1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 4:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-10-10 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Communications
Death
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Emergencies
Examinations
Family Law
Identification
Murder
Notices
Photography
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims
Communications
Death
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Emergencies
Examinations
Family Law
Identification
Murder
Notices
Photography
Privacy
Public Information
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims