MD SB5 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the information to be included in the Health Care Disparities Policy Report Card to include disparities in morbidity and mortality rates for dementia; requiring the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to publish health data that includes race and ethnicity information and to update the data biannually; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2023, to include at least $1,788,314 in the annual budget bill for the Office; requiring a certain program to identify and approve implicit bias training programs; etc.
Title
Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-37) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-6) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {227475/1 Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB28 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Death
Disclosure
Discrimination
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Federal Aid
Gender
Governor
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
internet
Job Training
Language
Licenses
Medical Conditions
Minorities
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Reports
Time
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Death
Disclosure
Discrimination
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Federal Aid
Gender
Governor
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
internet
Job Training
Language
Licenses
Medical Conditions
Minorities
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Reports
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |