MD SB504 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Special Education Ombudsman in the Office of the Attorney General to serve as a resource for information and support to parents, students, and educators regarding special education rights and services; requiring the Ombudsman to submit a report concerning the State's special education services by July 1, 2022, and each July 1 thereafter; requiring certain school personnel to provide the parents of a child with a disability written information about the Ombudsman and the toll-free telephone number; etc.
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Floor Amendment 453928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Floor Amendment 453928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-11) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-1) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (132-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {225268/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {453928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-28) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB699 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Communications
Consumer Protection
Discipline
Education
Language
Ombudsmen
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Special Education
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telephones
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Communications
Consumer Protection
Discipline
Education
Language
Ombudsmen
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Special Education
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telephones
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 6 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |