MD SB505 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain jurisdictions to report to the Department of the Environment information relating to the number of cases alleging violations of sediment and erosion control laws and regulations and building and grading permits by January 1 each year; requiring the Department to provide technical assistance to certain jurisdictions to help meet certain reporting requirements; requiring the Department to post certain information and an interactive map on its website; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-23) (Y: 116 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518
2019-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (116-23)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (33-13)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {234834/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback