MD SB505 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain prohibition against interfering with, injuring, tampering with, or destroying a horse used for a certain purpose to prohibit a person from interfering with, injuring, tampering with, or destroying an equine used for a certain purpose or for any other lawful activity; changing the crime from a felony to a misdemeanor carrying a fine not to exceed $1,000 or imprisonment not to exceed 1 year or both; providing the Act does not apply to the equine's owner or a person acting at the direction of or on behalf of the owner.
Title
Crimes Against Animals – Interference With Equines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {478878/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Racing
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Racing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |