MD SB515 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workforce Readiness Grant Program to provide matching grants to a community college to improve the community college's technology; authorizing each community college campus to accept certain donations that further the purpose of the Program; authorizing the Governor, in fiscal year 2022, to appropriate for each community college supplemental funding equal to the lesser of $250,000 for each campus of each community college or the amount of certain donations in fiscal years 2020 and 2021; etc.
Title
Community Colleges - Workforce Readiness Grant Program - Established
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {804632/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Colleges
Curriculum
Gifts
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Community Colleges
Curriculum
Gifts
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment