MD SB515 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1052
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain exception authorizing, under certain circumstances, a student who is a registered sex offender to enter onto real property used for public or nonpublic elementary or secondary education; authorizing a student who is a registered sex offender to receive an education in accordance with State law in a locale other than real property used for public or nonpublic education; requiring a county board of education and the State Board of Education to develop certain guidelines and model policies; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 483520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Floor Amendment 483520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Floor Amendment {483520/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (47-85) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {808170/1 Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Motion to remove committee amendment (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {928379/1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB48 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, R. Jones and Thiam)
SB1052 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Referred Judiciary
SB1052 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Referred Judiciary
Subjects
Counties
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Juvenile Causes
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Sexual Offenses
Students
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Juvenile Causes
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Sexual Offenses
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 722 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |