MD SB517 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to issue a temporary license to practice physical therapy and limited physical therapy to applicants who meet certain education and experience requirements but have not passed a certain examination; providing that a temporary license authorizes individuals to practice limited physical therapy or physical therapy under direct supervision and is valid for 90 days after issuance, until the board issues a full license, or the Board revokes the temporary license; etc.
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB210 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Education
Health Occupations
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Physical Therapists
Time
Discipline
Education
Health Occupations
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Physical Therapists
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 13 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 13 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 13 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 13 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |