MD SB522 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the membership of the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Health and the Secretary of Aging, or their designees, cochair the Council; requiring the members of the Council to select the chair; requiring the Council to update a certain plan, examine the needs of individuals with Alzheimer's disease and identify methods to meet those needs, provide certain advice to the Governor and the General Assembly, and develop and promote certain strategies; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411
2019-03-28SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {106089/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {217071/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-07SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0522&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0522f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0522t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0522e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_411_sb0522e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0522_21707101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0522_10608901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0522.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0522_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0385.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0522_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0954.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0829.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback