MD SB526 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield court records and police records relating to specified convictions at a specified time; providing that, if a person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction is not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; providing that a person is not eligible for shielding if the person is a defendant in a pending criminal proceeding; authorizing the court to grant a specified petition for good cause; etc.
Title
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {388272/2 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {388272/2 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Drugs
Education
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Officials
Records
Registration
State Employees
Victims
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Drugs
Education
Electronic Government
Ex-Offenders
Health Occupations
Hearings
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Officials
Records
Registration
State Employees
Victims
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment