MD SB527 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in an annual report certain statistics on job classifications for inmate labor, certain daily wage scales, and the total number of inmates currently employed at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain similar statistics regarding inmate employment and wages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-32) (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524
2019-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (107-32)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback