MD SB529 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the membership of the State Board of Education to add a certain certified teacher who is actively teaching and a parent of a student enrolled in a public school in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a certain teacher member with the advice and consent of the Senate after an election by teachers in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a certain parent member with the advice and consent of the Senate from a certain list submitted by the Maryland PTA; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-41) (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-5) (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (97-41)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-04-03HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (39-5)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {514532/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback