MD SB532 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing to 5 the minimum number of members of the board of directors that a domestic financial guaranty insurance company that is prohibited from issuing new policies must have on its board of directors.
Title
Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |