MD SB532 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding opportunities for veteran-owned small business enterprises to participate in State procurement contracts and the improvement of the veteran-owned small business enterprise program; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {897878/1 Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1007 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Veterans
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Veterans