MD SB533 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain short-term rental platforms to collect the sales and use tax on the sale of the right to occupy certain short-term rentals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-31) (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-3) (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 758
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (100-31)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-01HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (40-3)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {869532/3 Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateLaid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {869532/3
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback