MD SB538 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain hospitals and health systems to provide each patient with a written notice that includes certain information related to facility fees that are charged for outpatient services provided at hospital-based facilities; requiring that each initial billing statement to a patient from a hospital or health system that includes a facility fee include certain information; requiring that a certain written notice be provided to certain patients in a certain manner and at a certain time; etc.
Title
Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Advertising
Agents and Brokers
Clinics
Communications
Data
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
internet
Language
Liability
Literacy
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Notices
Patients
Postal Service
Public Information
Reimbursement Rates
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices
Agents and Brokers
Clinics
Communications
Data
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
internet
Language
Liability
Literacy
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Notices
Patients
Postal Service
Public Information
Reimbursement Rates
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices