MD SB543 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop and implement certain security protocols and protections to prohibit certain persons from accessing certain vital records and minimize the disclosure of certain information from a certain database; requiring certain security protocols and protections to include an auditable record of certain information; and authorizing the Secretary of Health to provide the State designated health information exchange with select information from death certificates for certain purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Vital Records – Health Information Exchange Data Access and Security Protocols and Protections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {617074/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback