MD SB554 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a tenant who is a victim of domestic violence or a victim of sexual assault to terminate a residential lease under specified circumstances; requiring a specified tenant to provide specified written notice to terminate a lease to the landlord; requiring a tenant who provides specified written notice to vacate the leased premises within 30 days of providing the notice; establishing the tenant's responsibilities for rent if the tenant terminates a lease under the Act; etc.
Title
Rental Housing - Protection for Victims of Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (139-1) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-02 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-10 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Courts
Discrimination
Domestic Violence
Eviction
Fees
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Locksmiths
Notices
Protection Orders
Safety
Security Deposits
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Courts
Discrimination
Domestic Violence
Eviction
Fees
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Locksmiths
Notices
Protection Orders
Safety
Security Deposits
Sexual Offenses
Victims