MD SB554 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to allow the matching fund requirement for the Warner Manor grant to include real property, in kind contributions, or funds expended on or after December 1, 2005; extending the deadline for the grantee to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided; requiring the Board of Public Works to expend or encumber the loan by June 1, 2013; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Warner

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-23 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-04 First Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback